judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BECKHAM (ROYAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38329
Short Caption:BECKHAM (ROYAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135964Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/24/2003How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13968
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/8/01; 3/28/01; 4/4/01; 4/18/01; 4/23/01; 5/21/01; 6/25/01; and 7/11/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Corneilius. Filed in district court on: August 21, 2001. 01-14266
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/6/01 and 6/27/01. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. Filed in district court on: August 21, 2001. 01-14268
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/5/00. Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. Filed in district court on: August 21, 2001. 01-14270
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/28/96; 7/11/96; 11/5/96; and 11/12/96. Court Reporter: James Helleso. Filed in district court on: August 21, 2001. 01-14271
09/04/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: September 5, 2001. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 01-14858
09/06/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/6/01 and 6/27/01. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 01-15034
09/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/28/96; 07/11/96; 11/05/96; 11/12/96. Court Reporter: James A. Helleso. 01-15224
09/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/8/01, 3/28/01, 4/4/01, 4/18/01, 4/23/01, 5/21/01, 6/25/01, and 7/11/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius. 01-15525
09/25/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 24 Page Fast Track Statement. 01-16142
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 25, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on September 25, 2001. 01-16323
09/27/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16144
09/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16145
10/02/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 15 Page Fast Track Response. 01-16601
10/05/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 2, 2001. The clerk shall filed the 15 pages fast track response received on October 2, 2001. 01-16759
10/05/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16602
07/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 02-12300
08/27/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 27, 2002. 02-14703
09/26/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express - no postmark. 02-16738
10/16/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 02-18022
12/10/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
01/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 03-01287
01/24/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/10/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-06018
05/06/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-06308
05/06/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/14/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2003. 03-06308