judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FRANKLIN CLARK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0054
Short Caption:FRANKLIN CLARK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 08-CM-0887 Consolidated:11-CO-0054
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD22313-07Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFranklin Clark Y
Sydney Jean HoffmannYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/18/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sydney Hoffmann, Esquire
02/01/2011ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE and appeals nos. 08-CM-887 and 11-CO-54 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Sydney Hoffmann, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant nunc pro tun to January 18, 2011, in appeal no. 11-CO-54. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record in appeal no. 11-CO-54 and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for appeal no. 11-CO-54 has been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court of the complete record on appeal in appeal no. 11-CO-54. (By: JAC)
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (61pgs/Tape) 12/17/10 proc. w/CD
02/07/2011RECORD INDEX (11CO54)
02/07/2011RECORD COPIES (11CO54)
02/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/15/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
03/31/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief (no appdx)
04/11/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX (no appdx)
04/11/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (volume I-II)
04/13/2011ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTIONS and the lodged brief of appellant and appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/13/2011APPENDIX (2 volumes)
05/12/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/10/11
05/26/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/10/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/16/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/30/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/05/2012FiledMemorandum - from USAO attorney Erik Kenerson wll argue the case in place of B. Michael Ortwein (Appellee)
01/17/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
01/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
04/30/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
05/22/2012FiledMandate