judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOUIS D. COSCO v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections; EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary; WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Agency of Wyoming; and STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0106)
Case Number:S-09-0106Case Docketed On:05/28/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:LOUIS D. COSCO v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections; EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary; WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Agency of Wyoming; and STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LOUIS D. COSCO, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director, Wyoming Department of Corrections; EDDIE WILSON, Warden, Wyoming State Penitentiary; WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Agency of Wyoming; and STATE OF WYOMING; Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLouis D. Cosco Pro Se
AppelleeRobert O. LampertBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
AppelleeEddie WilsonBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
AppelleeDepartment of CorrectionsBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2010 WY 52
Citation:229 P.3d 963

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/28/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/28/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding case caption.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/02/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant regarding case caption.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/11/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding caption. No response sent.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/13/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/13/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/14/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/14/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/31/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief- third. Motion for extension of time postmarked 08/27/09.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/31/2009Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further extensions consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Intent and ComplianceNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/14/2009Brief - Appellant (Timely per prisoner delivery rule)BriefAppellantFinal
10/26/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
11/12/2009Motion - Extension of time - reply briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/12/2009Order - Denying Appellant's request for extension to file reply briefOrderDenyFinal
11/16/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four total volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Attachments (District Court Case # 172-326); Volume III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Attachments (District Court Case # 172-463).RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2010Order - Assignment of judgeOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/14/2010Petition - Rehearing. This petition was considered timely filed due to W.R.A.P. Rule 14, prisoner delivery rule. Mandate has issued.PetitionRehearingFinal
05/17/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/25/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
05/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Extension of tile Writ of CertiorariNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
04/01/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - petition for writ of certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
06/23/2011Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court Petition for Rehearing deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal