judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICARDO ESCOBAR-MOLINA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0053
Short Caption:RICARDO ESCOBAR-MOLINA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17998-10Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/11/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicardo Escobar-Molina N
Dominic G. VorvYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter C. LallasNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
03/15/2011ORDERED: That this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
03/15/2011WithdrawnDISMISSED
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL (Titled as: Motion to Reopen)dwm
04/14/2011RECEIVED - request for transcript
04/29/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged statement regarding transcript. (By: ETW)
04/29/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (we are waiting on 12/17/10 proc.)
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (52pgs/Price) 12/17/10 proc. w/CD
08/11/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/15/2011FiledRecord Index
08/15/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/17/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 60 days (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until November 25, 2011
11/28/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/28/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before February 3, 2012
02/03/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
02/06/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/18/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/18/2012FiledAffirmed
06/11/2012FiledMandate