judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN (CAROL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38328
Short Caption:COLEMAN (CAROL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010062AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13967
09/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. -SEALED- Proceedings: August 8, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 01-15154
09/13/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15483
09/13/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15484
09/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 9, 2001. Court Reporter: Donna Davidson. 01-15767
10/01/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16489
10/09/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We have determined that a copy of the presentence investigation report filed in district court is necessary for this court's consideration of this appeal. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward to the clerk of this court, within 10 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of the presentence investigation report in a sealed envelope. Upon this court's receipt of the sealed presentence investigation report, it shall be included in the appendix for consideration by this court. 01-17008
10/16/2001Other Other. Filed Copy of Presentence Investigation Report (SEALED). 01-17472
11/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19214
12/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19544
12/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2001. 01-19544
02/26/2002RemittiturIssued Return Letter. Returned Original Certified Transcripts filed on September 7, 2001 and September 18, 2001 this day. 01-19544
03/04/2002RemittiturFiled Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on March 1, 2002. 01-19544