judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1573-96
PD-1573-96
11/05/1996
PDR Case Type
PERRILLOUX, GEORGE BRYCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/28/1997FINAL DISPRefused
02/12/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/12/1997PDR DISPRefused
12/06/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/05/1996PDR FILED
11/05/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
PERRILLOUX, GEORGE BRYCEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)David A. Schulman
Court of Appeals Information:
03-95-00011-CR
AFF 8-28-96
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
147th District Court
Travis
Honorable TOM BLACKWELL
0945232