judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-96-01358-CR
14-96-01358-CR
11/05/1996
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Price, Phillip Lipshear
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/12/1997Case stored
05/08/1997Mandate due to be issued
05/08/1997Mandate Issued
05/08/1997Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
05/08/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/08/1997State's brief DUE
05/08/1997Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/08/1997Mandate Issued
05/06/1997Submission
05/06/1997Submitted
04/29/1997Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
04/28/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/28/1997Case ready to be set
04/28/1997Case ready to be set
04/10/1997Appellant's brief DUE
04/10/1997Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/18/1997Statement of Facts Due
03/11/1997Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/30/1997Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
01/24/1997Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
01/17/1997Statement of Facts Due
12/05/1996Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/05/1996Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEDENIED
12/02/1996Transcript FILED
11/27/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/27/1996Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE
11/21/1996Transcript received only; mtn. pending
11/18/1996Record due
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1996Date of Sentence
09/18/1996Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/2017Case StoredCase archived
05/08/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PRICE, PHILLIP LIPSHEARCriminal - AppellantLayton W. Duer
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable JANICE M. KROCKER
693,411
9 Years TDCJ