judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00547-CV
13-96-00547-CV
11/05/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Marroquin, Delma J., d/b/a Luckie's Bonding Service
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/1998Cite for opinions
10/21/1997Mandate Issued
08/21/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/08/1997Submitted
08/08/1997Submission
07/16/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
07/16/1997Submission
01/29/1997Filing Fee Paid
01/21/1997Notice was filed
12/03/1996Brief Filed
12/03/1996Case ready to be set
12/03/1996No oral argument requested
11/26/1996Statement Filed
11/20/1996Statement Filed
11/05/1996STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
11/05/1996Transcript Filed
11/05/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/05/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/05/1996Transcript Received
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/21/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfAppelleeWalter D. Bryan
Marroquin, Delma J. D/b/a LucAppellantMichael A. `Mickey` Kolpack
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert Blackmon
96-1748-B