judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTRADA (MARIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38322
Short Caption:ESTRADA (MARIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010148Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13920
08/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: June 11 and 12, 2001. Court Reporter: D. Vierra. Filed in district court on: August 20, 2001. 01-14328
09/05/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 7, 11, 12, 2001 and July 19, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie P. Vieira. 01-14981
09/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: October 1, 2001. 01-16065
10/03/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-16668
10/05/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 3, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement and appendix received on October 3, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-16757
10/05/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16670
10/05/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-16675
10/30/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: November 2, 2001. 01-18160
11/05/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-18463
12/04/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20250
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20340
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2002. 01-20340