judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LISA LAUDERMAN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, ex rel., JEN, a minor child, and RUSSELL NOMURA

Case Heading (S-09-0100)
Case Number:S-09-0100Case Docketed On:05/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LISA LAUDERMAN v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, ex rel., JEN, a minor child, and RUSSELL NOMURA
Full Title:LISA LAUDERMAN, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, ex rel., JEN, a minor child, Appellee (Petitioner), and RUSSELL NOMURA, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLisa LaudermanWendy Press Sweeny
AppelleeDepartment of Family ServicesBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Elizabeth Bartels Lance
AppelleeRussell NomuraDavid Michael Clark

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Support
Opinion Number:2010 WY 70
Citation:232 P.3d 604

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Statement of Costs and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Errata to brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Department of Family Services.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/17/2009Brief - Appellee Russell Nomura.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Russell Nomura and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/31/2009Brief - Appellant reply to brief of Appellee/Department of Family ServicesBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief to Appellee DFSEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/10/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
05/28/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the Court, Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/22/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal