judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VYRON WHEELER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0050
Short Caption:VYRON WHEELER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1386-96Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVyron WheelerYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 13, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
02/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (sent over from Superior Court).
02/09/2011RECORD INDEX
02/09/2011RECORD COPIES
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011ORDER DENY APLT MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: ETW)
03/07/2011APPENDIX (refiled as appendix on 6/29/11)
04/05/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on March 7, 2011, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before March 28, 2011, and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (Castillo)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (filed nunc pro tunc) (Served on US by the court)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (Re-filed as MALB on 6/29/11)
04/18/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Brief. (refiled on 6/29/11)
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged limited appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
05/04/2011APPENDIX
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for correction of the record on appeal
06/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 1, 2011
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - of appeal for correction of the record (USAO served)
06/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/27/2011FiledTMC/Motion for summary affirmance/MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE (LODGED) OPPO/APPELLANT'S BRIEF/APPENDIX/ORDER
06/29/2011On consideration of appellant's motionto correct the record, and motion to stay for correction of record, and appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief, and appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and appellee's motion for summary affirmance, to which no oppositions have been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to correct the record is granted to the extent that this court's order of May 4, 2011 is hereby vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED tht the Clerk shall re-file the March 7, 2011, document as appellant's appendix. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011F/ORDERED that the Clerk shall re-file the April 18, 2011, pleading as appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011F/ORDERED that the motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged brief nunc pro tunc to April 18, 2011. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011F/ORDERED that appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and appellee's brief, if any, shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. It is F/ORDERED that appellee's motion for summary affirmacne is hereby held in abeyance pending furthr order of this court. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011F/ORDERED that appellant shall file a response to appellee's motion for summary affirmance within 20 days from the date of this order. It is (MORE)
06/29/2011F/ORDERED that appellant's motion for stay is denied as moot. (ETW)
07/21/2011FiledCONSTRUED AS MOTION TO FILE AN OPPOSITIONGranted
10/20/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave AND THE CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED OPPOSITION...and
10/20/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/20/2011FiledOPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/20/2011FiledAffirmed
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing En Banc for 7 days. (Appellant)
11/08/2011LodgedPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
11/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file the lodged appellant's pro se petition for rehearing en banc.
11/10/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate
06/14/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
06/15/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE
07/09/2012FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE