judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: AP-72,561
AP-72,561
11/05/1996
Appeal Case Type
HOGUES, EX PARTE JESSE LLOYD, SR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/06/1997LETTER RECEIVED
11/22/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
11/22/1996MANDATE ISSD
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
11/06/1996OPINION ISSDHC Relief granted
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
11/05/1996WRIT FILED
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
11/05/1996SET FOR SUBMIS
11/05/1996SUBMITTED
11/05/1996WRIT FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/09/1999STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJr., Charles J. Sebesta
HOGUES, EX PARTE JESSE LLOYD,ApplicantJesse Lloyd Sr Hogues
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Burleson
Honorable H. R. HOWSLEE
11,313-A