judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-96-00624-CV
03-96-00624-CV
11/05/1996
Malpractice
Rhonda Cramer McClure
Dr. Henry Landis and Interim Physicians, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
11/29/1999Case stored
06/12/1998Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
05/11/1998Mandate Issued
05/11/1998Letter requesting pickup of exhibits
03/13/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
01/21/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
01/13/1998miscellaneous motion disp
01/02/1998miscellaneous motion filed
11/13/1997Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/08/1997Letter brief filed
09/29/1997Letter brief filed
09/24/1997Post-submission brief received
09/17/1997Submitted
09/17/1997Submission
09/12/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/15/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/04/1997Submission
05/22/1997Staff recommendation for mediationNo for mediation
05/15/1997Brief filed
05/15/1997Case ready to be set
04/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/07/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/21/1997Brief filed
03/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Brief received, not filed
03/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/06/1997Mot ext time file STRANS DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/1997Mt file Supp Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/1996Exhibits filed
12/17/1996Supplemental Transcript filed
12/17/1996Exhibits received
12/17/1996Supplemental Transcript Received
12/11/1996Mt file Supplemental Record Filed
12/06/1996Docketing statement or response
12/04/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/04/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1996Supplemental Transcript filed
11/27/1996Supplemental Transcript Received
11/22/1996Response to Motion
11/21/1996Mt extension of time file Supplemental Trans filed
11/19/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/15/1996Designation filed
11/15/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/15/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/14/1996ADR letter w/docketing statement
11/13/1996Response requested (postcard)
11/05/1996Transcript Filed
11/05/1996Transcript Received
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwest Texas State UniversityInterested partyMr. David Allan Smith
Mcclure, Rhonda CramerAppellantMr. J. Michael Black
Mr. R. Todd Elias
Mr. Daryl L. Moore
Interim Physicians, Inc.AppelleeMr. John M. Curney Jr.
Landis, HenryAppelleeMr. John M. Curney Jr.
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Hays
Honorable William E. Bender
95-0921