judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-96-00424-CV
08-96-00424-CV
11/05/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Dept. of Public Safety
Seng Panngasiri
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/26/1997Mandate Issued
06/26/1997Shuck purged
06/26/1997Mandate Issued
05/14/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/28/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
04/17/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/17/1997Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
04/17/1997Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
04/02/1997Submitted
04/02/1997Submission
04/02/1997Submitted
03/31/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/17/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/17/1997Motion to be passed and considered with the casePass & Consider W/Case
03/17/1997Order entered
03/12/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/06/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
03/03/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
02/19/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/03/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/30/1997Miscellaneous Motion Filed
01/02/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/02/1997Transcript Filed
11/05/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/26/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PANNGASIRI, SENGAppelleeHon. Richard C. Robins
TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFAppellantHon. Charles R. Maddox
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
96-1400