judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-96-00241-CV
10-96-00241-CV
11/05/1996
Mandamus
Curtis R. Francis, Relator
Honorable Phillip H. Zeigler and Carolyn Pollard, Respondents
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/02/2003Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/02/1997Case stored
01/02/1997Motion for Rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied
12/13/1996Motion for Rehearing filed
12/04/1996(NO ACK) Writ disposed.Motion or Writ Denied
11/05/1996Motion for Leave to File.
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/2003Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zeigler, Phillip H.RespondentHon. Phillip H. Zeigler
Francis, Curtis R.RelatorCurtis R. Francis
Trial Court Information
Honorable Phillip H. Zeigler