judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-96-00327-CR
12-96-00327-CR
11/05/1996
Revocation of Probation
Preston, Patrick N.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/13/1998ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
01/05/1998Mandate Issued
01/05/1998Case stored
12/19/1997Petition for discretionary review was not filed
12/04/1997Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/19/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1997Submitted
11/13/1997Submission
10/17/1997Submission
04/24/1997Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/1997Prescreened
03/28/1997motion to supplement record filed
03/28/1997Supplemental Transcript Received
03/28/1997Brief Filed
03/28/1997Case ready to be set
03/28/1997supplemental transcript filed
03/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/27/1997Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997Brief Filed
01/21/1997Brief Received
01/08/1997Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
12/27/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ No Action Taken
12/20/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/12/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion passed
12/04/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/19/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/15/1996Letter from the Court
11/12/1996Supplemental Transcript Received
11/12/1996supplemental transcript filed
11/08/1996No Description Available.
11/08/1996No Description Available.
11/05/1996
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/04/1996Transcript Due
10/04/1996Order Entered
10/03/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/03/1996Date Sentence Given in Open Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1998Case StoredCase stored
01/05/2023RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Preston, Patrick N.Criminal - AppellantMs. Sharon N. Pruitt
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Edward J. Marty
Trial Court Information
241st District Court
Smith
Honorable Diane Vinson De Vasto
1-93-464
4 yrs TDCJ