judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-96-00246-CV
10-96-00246-CV
11/05/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Freddie Louis Brewer
Jeffrey D. Miller, et al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2003Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/02/2003Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk.
06/17/1997Case stored
06/17/1997Mandate issued by this Court
04/30/1997Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
03/19/1997Submitted
03/19/1997Submission
02/18/1997Submission
01/29/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/24/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
01/24/1997Case ready to be set
01/24/1997Brief received, not filed
01/21/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
01/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/19/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
11/22/1996Brief filed, oral argument not requested
11/05/1996No Description Available.
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2003Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brewer, Freddie LouisAppellantFreddie Louis Brewer
Barton, Linda S.AppelleeEdward P. Sanchez
Easley, James D.AppelleeJ. Lee Haney
Miller, Jeffrey D.AppelleeJ. Lee Haney
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Coryell
Honorable Susan R. Stephens
96-1509