judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-96-00242-CR
10-96-00242-CR
11/05/1996
Assault & battery
Timothy James Grant
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/03/1998Case stored
03/03/1998Mandate issued by this Court
02/11/1998Case returned from higher court
01/21/1998Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/10/1997Case forwarded to higher court
11/07/1997Petition for Discretionary Review filed
10/08/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/07/1997Submitted
05/07/1997Submission
04/14/1997Submission
04/10/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
04/10/1997Case ready to be set
04/04/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
03/05/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
02/05/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
01/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
12/02/1996No Description Available.
12/02/1996No Description Available.
11/18/1996No Description Available.
11/15/1996No Description Available.
11/05/1996Notice of Appeal filed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/03/2023Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grant, Timothy JamesAppellantLinda Grant
Kenneth L. Ables
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn W. Segrest
Philip D. Frederick
Mike Freeman
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
Honorable George Allen
95-632-C
11 yrs, 11 yrs both count