judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-96-00299-CV
02-96-00299-CV
11/05/1996
Miscellaneous civil
In the Interest of J.E.B., M.M.B., T.E.B., S.K.B., and M.M.B., Children (Bell)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/25/2009Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/26/1998Mandate Issued
04/16/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/11/1998Submitted
02/11/1998Submission
02/05/1998Letter from Attorneys Waiving Oral Argument
01/22/1998Letter from Attorneys Waiving Oral Argument
11/10/1997Amended Brief Filed
11/10/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1997Motion Filed
10/24/1997Brief Filed
10/24/1997Case ready to be set
09/02/1997Brief Filed
09/02/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/07/1997Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
07/22/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/16/1997Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
06/24/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/27/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/27/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/18/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/10/1997Motion Filed
03/05/1997No Description Available.
03/05/1997Submission
02/24/1997No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1997No Description Available.
12/11/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/09/1996No Description Available.
11/19/1996No Description Available.
11/08/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/05/1996Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2009Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserAppelleeNancy A. Trease
Bell, TonyAppellantLarry D. Richter
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Wichita
Honorable Jim C. Hogan
CCL-680-93-E