judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAVELY (BYRON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38321
Short Caption:SAVELY (BYRON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Eureka Co. - Seventh Judicial District - 973Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13917
08/15/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 18, 2000, September 15, 2000 and July 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. Filed in district court on: August 3, 2001. 01-13918
08/16/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 18, 2000, September 15, 2000 and July 6, 2001. Court Reporter: Gloria Jean Smith. 01-13933
09/24/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16116
09/24/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16117
09/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Fast Track Statement. 01-16419
09/28/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16425
10/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17182
10/12/2001MotionFiled Motion. Request to Remove Document from Appendix. 01-17273
11/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-19077
12/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 12, 2001, appellant filed a request to remove a document from the appendix to the fast track statement. On November 15, 2001, this court entered an order of affirmance in this appeal. This court did not consider the document in question in the resolution of this appeal, and the motion is denied as moot. 01-20732
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19664
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 14, 2001. 01-19664