judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANIEL C. FABER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-09-0099)
Case Number:S-09-0099Case Docketed On:05/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:DANIEL C. FABER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:DANIEL C. FABER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDaniel C. FaberElizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Michael Thomas Kahler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI
Opinion Number:2009 WY 137
Citation:220 P.3d 236

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
05/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/15/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
05/21/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
07/02/2009Brief - Appellant, with statement of costs in appendix.BriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's opening brief with statement of costs in appendix and received copy of brief on disk.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, The State of Wyoming, Department of Transportation; and received copy of designation of record on appeal; and copy of brief and designation of record on disk.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/26/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/09/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Letter from District Clerk re failure of counsel for Appellant to file designation. (Faxed)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/14/2009Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
09/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Letter from District Clerk re failure of counsel for Appellant to file designation. (Original)Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
09/21/2009Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
09/28/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/06/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/10/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/2/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal