judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1574-96
PD-1574-96
11/05/1996
PDR Case Type
WOODS, CANDACE WAGGONER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/27/1997SUPP BR FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
05/12/1997BRIEF FILEDAppellant
04/11/1997BRIEF FILEDState Prosecuting Attorney
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/21/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate of a process
11/21/1997MANDATE ISSD
11/05/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
11/05/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
11/05/1997OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Remanded COA
06/27/1997SUPP BR FILED
06/13/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted of a process
06/13/1997SUBMITTED
06/11/1997NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
06/04/1997NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
05/28/1997NOTICE OF COUNSEL PRESENTING ARGUMENT
05/15/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission of a process
05/15/1997SET FOR SUBMIS
05/12/1997BRIEF FILED
04/11/1997BRIEF FILED
03/12/1997PDR GRANTED
03/12/1997PDR DISPGranted
03/12/1997PDR DISPGranted
12/06/1996NO RESPONSE FILED
11/07/1996SUPPLEMENT TO PDR FILED
11/05/1996PDR FILED
11/05/1996PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateMatthew Paul
Ronald Earle
WOODS, CANDACE WAGGONERApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Keith S. Hampton
Court of Appeals Information:
03-95-00491-CR
REV & REM 10-16-96
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable MICAHEL LYNCH
0950216