judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00646-CV
01-82-00646-CV
07/21/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Harkins, M. D.
Mary Lee Calhoun
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
02/24/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/03/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Submission
09/27/1982Brief filed
09/02/1982Brief filed
08/25/1982Transcript filed
07/21/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Burleson
Honorable JOHN L. PLACKE
17,340