judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-82-00123-CR
12-82-00123-CR
07/21/1982
Theft
Stewart, Don Kevin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1985
05/22/1985Mandate Issued
05/06/1985
04/05/1985
03/21/1985Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1984Submitted
03/29/1984Submission
03/18/1983Brief Filed
02/10/1983Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/08/1983Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/19/1983Brief Filed
12/21/1982Record Filed
12/20/1982
10/28/1982Mot ext time file record dispMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1982
07/23/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1985Case StoredCase stored
06/04/2010RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
114th District Court
Smith
482-9
4 years probation