judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-82-00255-CV
07-82-00255-CV
07/21/1982
Automobile Personal Injury
Travelers Indemnity Company of Rhode Island
West, Billye G. West
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/12/1984Mandate Issued
06/12/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/06/1984Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
05/09/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/23/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
02/06/1984Submitted
12/07/1983Submission
08/30/1982Case ready to be set
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/12/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
237th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable John R. McFall
94,080