judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00640-CV
01-82-00640-CV
07/21/1982
Miscellaneous/other civil
Alexander, John
Joe O. Barlow, et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/18/1983No description available.
11/10/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
08/20/1983Petition for writ of error from trial court
07/21/1983Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
07/14/1983Emergency motion to advance appeal
07/14/1983Opposition filed
07/07/1983Motion for rehearing filed
06/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1983Submitted
04/29/1983Submission
12/16/1982Brief filed
11/10/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/22/1982Brief filed
10/07/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
09/20/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/26/1982Statement of facts filed
08/23/1982Transcript filed
07/21/1982Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
129th District Court
Harris
81-32959