judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-82-00099-CR
10-82-00099-CR
07/22/1982
Burglary of a Building
Lou Anthony Bellone
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/01/1983Case stored
06/01/1983Mandate issued by this Court
03/31/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/24/1983Submitted
07/22/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
81-580-C
18 Years and $1,000 Fine