judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALLSTATE INSURANCE VS. CORDEIRO

Case Information: 38332
Short Caption:ALLSTATE INSURANCE VS. CORDEIROCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389391Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/2001 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Burton Bartlett & Glogovac--check no. 9636.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14009
08/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14814
09/05/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. E. Leslie Combs, Jr.
11/21/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-19628
11/21/2001Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 01-19629
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b) NNP/CLK 01-20815
12/12/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.