judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD ROBBINS PANCAKE V. MONICA BOYD PANCAKE

Case Information: 11-FM-0057
Short Caption:RICHARD ROBBINS PANCAKE V. MONICA BOYD PANCAKEClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Relations
Lead: 10-FM-1208 Consolidated:11-FM-0057
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3676-08Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard Robbins Pancake N
Robert Case LiottaNY
AppelleeMonica Boyd Pancake N
Craig L. Davitian YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/11/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file a motion to supplement the record with the July 14, 2009 transcript in the trial court so that it can certify the accuracy of transcript. See D.C. App. R. 10. It is (MORE)
02/11/2011ORDER GRANT APPELLANT MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL and appeal no. 10-FM-1208 is hereby reinstated. It is (MORE)
02/11/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the Clerk shall file the lodged statement regarding trasncript in appeal no. 10-FM-1208. It is (MORE)
02/11/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 10-FM-1208 and 11-FM-57 for all purposes herein. It is F/O that appellant shall advise this court within 20 days from the date of this order as to the status of the motion filed in the trial court. (ETW)
02/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 6/29/09 6/30/09 7/8/09 7/9/09 7/13/09 7/14/09 (rt. needed)
02/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (10-FM-1208)
02/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (11-FM-57)
02/14/2011TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss - motion to file R. 60 - motion to file (LODGED) oppo
02/25/2011APPELLEE'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file a rule 60 motion for relief from judgment w/the trial court
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to the order of 2/11/11 regarding the motion to supplement the record w/a copy of the 7/14/09 transcript w/ Superior Court
03/23/2011RECEIVED - mot for leave to file oppo out of time & aplt's oppo. (motion did not comply w/rule 27--returned 3/24)
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION
03/25/2011RECEIVED - aplt's oppo to aple's mot to dismiss.
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION to file OPPOSITION OUT OF TIME IS GRANTED and the Clek will file the opposition. It is ****MORE*****
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTIONS ARE DENIED. It is *****MORE******
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RULE 60(b) motion IS DENIED AS MOOT. (GLPRFE) (cb)
04/01/2011RECEIVED- aple's oppo to aplt's motion for leave to file oppo to the motion to dismiss
04/01/2011RECEIVED-aple's response to aplt's rule 27 certificate
04/08/2011RECORD INDEX (10FM1208 and 11FM57) (One RINDX for both appeals)
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (135 pgs/tape) 6/29/09 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (119 pgs/tape) 6/30/09 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (132 pgs/tape) 7/8/09 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (174 pgs/tape) 7/13/09 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
06/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 8/21/11
06/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before August 31, 2011. (JAC)
08/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledOrder directing appendix
09/22/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - appendix (Appellant)Denied
09/22/2011StruckAppendix (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledMotion To Strike Appellant's Appendix and Request for Sanctions (Appellee)Granted
09/27/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Leave to File Appendix Late (Appellee)
10/11/2011FiledOpposition to motion to skrike appendix. (Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion For Leave to File - appendix (Appellant), granting appellee's motion to the extent that the lodged appendix is struck, directing joint appendix
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Strike Appellant's Appendix and Request for Sanctions (Appellee) to the extent that the lodged appenidx is struck
11/02/2011WithdrawnMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)
11/04/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledMotion - to dismiss the aple's motion to dismiss that was filed on November 2, 2011 (see docket entry) (Appellee)Granted
11/07/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant), Motion - to dismiss the aple's motion to dismiss that was filed on November 2, 2011 (see docket entry) (Appellee)
11/16/2011FiledJoint Appendix (Appellant)
12/16/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/16/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2012FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledOpposition to motion for oral argument (Appellee)
03/09/2012FiledMotion for assignment to mediation conference and stay pending counclusion of mediation proceedings (Appellee)Granted
03/15/2012FiledOpposition to motion for assignment of mediation conference and stay. (Appellant)
03/28/2012FiledOrder Granting motions for oral argment and mediation conference.
04/05/2012FiledAppearance - Craig L. Davitian (Appellee)
04/06/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)
04/10/2012FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Easterly, King
04/10/2012FiledOpposition - to appellee's motion for order of sanctions etc. (Appellant)
04/13/2012FiledOpposition to appellee's motion for order of santions etc.... (Appellant)
05/15/2012FiledOrder Denying
07/11/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Remanding Record
11/02/2012FiledChange Of Address Received from Craig Davitian (Appellee)
01/17/2013FiledMotion To Expedite Appeal (Appellant)
01/23/2013FiledOpposition to appellant's motion to expedite appeal (Appellee)
02/25/2013FiledCourtsey copy of the Superior Court order entered on 2/22/13 titled "Supplement to the amended order of December 9, 2010 pursuant to the July 11, 2012 order of the DC Court of Appeals" issued by Judge Mitchell-Rankin
02/25/2013FiledSupplemental Record #5 - Superior Court order entered on 2/22/13 titled "Supplement to the amended order of December 9, 2010 pursuant to the July 11, 2012 order of the DC Court of Appeals" issued by Judge Mitchell-Rankin
03/07/2013FiledBriefing Order (Supplemental)
03/15/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
03/18/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
03/27/2013FiledSupplemental Brief reply (Appellee)
04/05/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File to corrected supplemental brief Other (Appellant)Granted
04/30/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file corrected supplemental brief.
04/30/2013FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
05/15/2013FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part (MOJ) (Thompson, Easterly & King, Associate Judges.)
06/06/2013FiledMandate