judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CANNON VS. CANNON

Case Information: 38331
Short Caption:CANNON VS. CANNONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - DRMD0031171Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/22/2001 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/11/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Richard F. Cornell--check no. 9008.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13984
08/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14059
08/22/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/13/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 10, 2001. 01-18817
01/07/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 13, 2001; June 14, 2001; June 15, 2001; and December 18, 2000. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter, Fourth Judicial District Court, Dept. 1. 02-00393
01/14/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-00901
01/25/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Court reporter for the Fourth Judicial district Court, Department 1, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts requested by appellant pursuant to the transcript request filed on January 7, 2002. Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-01750
02/19/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/13/01; 6/14/01; 6/15/01. (Court reporter states in cover letter that the 12/18/00 hearing was not recorded; therefore, no transcript will be provided.) Court Reporter: Tia Lange. 02-03112
03/21/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/21/02. Signed by: Richard F. Cornell. 02-05078
03/21/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. 02-05079
04/09/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. 02-06291
04/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief by May 14, 2002. Appeals involving child custody are subject to the expedited briefing schedule set forth in NRAP 31(a)(2). No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-06547
05/10/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 05/08/02. Signed by: Nancy Porter. 02-08217
05/10/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Supplemental Joint Appendix, Volume V. 02-08218
05/20/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/20/02. 02-08881
09/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-15745
09/11/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
10/16/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-17958
10/29/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Law Office of Richard F. Cornell--check no. 9702.
10/29/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. 02-18644
11/05/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-19060
11/12/2002Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 9717 in the amount of $100 returned to Richard F. Cornell. A filing fee is not required for filing a Petition for En Banc Reconsideration.
11/12/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Mailed on: Hand Delivered - Reno Carson 11/12/02. 02-19452
12/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19651
12/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/18/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC 02-21602
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2002. 02-19651