judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYOMING MEDICAL CENTER, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WYOMING INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming non-profit unincorporated legal entity

Case Heading (S-09-0109)
Case Number:S-09-0109Case Docketed On:06/09/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:WYOMING MEDICAL CENTER, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. WYOMING INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming non-profit unincorporated legal entity
Full Title:WYOMING MEDICAL CENTER, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Defendant), v. WYOMING INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, a Wyoming non-profit unincorporated legal entity, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWyoming Medical Center, Inc., a Wyoming corporationStephenson Dow Emery
AppelleeWyoming Insurance Guaranty Association, a Wyoming non-profit unincorporated legal entityJames R. Bell

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Insurance Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 21
Citation:225 P.3d 1061 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/09/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/09/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/27/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Brief - Petitioner replyBriefPetitioner replyFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephenson Emery for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/02/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two Volumes, Volumes I & II, Original Papers. (Record received three days late)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/21/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephenson D. Emery for appellant; James R. Bell for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/26/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/16/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/18/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/17/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal