judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRYSTAL BARNES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CO-0056
Short Caption:CRYSTAL BARNES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Sentencing Issues only
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-4141-10Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCrystal Barnes YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/09/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been PREMATURELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (b). (BY: ETW)
02/09/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
02/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
03/09/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App R. 4. (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/09/2011DISMISSED
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (In letter format). (Served by: DCCA on 4/25/11).
04/26/2011TMC - motion for reconsideration
05/05/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER IS DENIED. (GLPRNB)