judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

LESTER L. LEVY JR. TRUST AND JACK M. LEVY TRUST, WILFORD W. NAMAN, TRUSTEE v. W. B. TARVER

Case: A-4640
A-4640
04/15/1954
Application for Writ of Error
LESTER L. LEVY JR. TRUST AND JACK M. LEVY TRUST, WILFORD W. NAMAN, TRUSTEE
W. B. TARVER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/08/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/29/1954Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/24/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/1954Response to Motion filed
06/08/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/29/1954Reply to Response
04/24/1954Response to Petition
04/15/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/15/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. B. TarverRespondent
Lester L. Levy Jr. Trust and Jack M. Levy Trust, Wilford W. Naman, TrusteePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information