judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLARY L. BOWMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0713
Short Caption:CLARY L. BOWMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2679-79Filed Date:06/09/1980

Opening Event Date:06/09/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClary L. Bowman N
David B. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BOWMAN, CLARY L. UNITED STATES
06/09/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/22/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID B. SMITH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/31/1988MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RECALL THE APPELLATE MANDATE & MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1988APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE TO OCTOBER 13TH JB PANEL SCDATE 091288 SCHPRD OPE
09/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO TO MO TO RECALL MANDAT TO 10/13/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD ANSA
10/13/1988APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO OCTOBER 25, 1988 TO APLT'S MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 101388 SCHPRD OPE
10/19/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO TO MO TO RECALL MANDAT TO 10/25/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 102488 SCHPRD CHECK
10/25/1988APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE MLR PANEL SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD OPE
11/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY TO APLE'S OPPO TO MO TO RECALL THE MAN- DATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989RECEIVED LETTER DATED 4/24/89 FROM E.M. BOWMAN REGARDING MICHAEL FAR- RELL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1989LETTER IN RESPONSE TO THE 4/24/89 LTR RECEIVED BY THIS COURT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(641 PGS/PAVLISH) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(219 STUCKY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(14 PGS/IRVING) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
07/24/1989ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE. MEH PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 071889 SCHPRD VS
07/24/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - D METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
08/30/1990RECEIVED LTR OF PRO SE APPELLANT RE MOT TO RECALL MANDATE JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1990LETTER ADVISING APLT OF STATUS OF MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD