judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COMET ENERGY SERVICES LLC v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC,

Case Heading (S-07-0063)
Case Number:S-07-0063Case Docketed On:03/21/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:COMET ENERGY SERVICES LLC v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC,
Full Title:COMET ENERGY SERVICES LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, Appellant (Defendant), v. POWDER RIVER OIL & GAS VENTURES, LLC, a Colorado limited liability company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantComet Energy Services, LLCThomas Reese
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleePowder River Oil & Gas Ventures, LLCBlake M. Pickett

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 69
Citation:185 P.3d 1259

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/21/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/21/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/04/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and improperly designated record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
05/04/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant. Requested copy brief, only five copies received and advised that the designation of record is filed in the trial courtEventPhone CallFinal
05/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Other, received additional copy of brief of appellantBriefOtherFinal
06/19/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2007Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on CDBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/16/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, large memorandum; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Thomas F. Reese on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Orintha Elizabeth Karns on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Blake M. Pickett on behalf appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Thomas Reese for appellant; Blake M. Pickett for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/10/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal