judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00538-CR
01-82-00538-CR
07/23/1982
Theft
Barber, Franklin Lane
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/08/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
08/10/1983Submitted
06/30/1983Submission
06/21/1983No description available.
06/02/1983Brief filed
06/02/1983Motion to supplement the reporter's record disposed.
05/26/1983Motion to supplement record
05/12/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.
05/03/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/14/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/13/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/03/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/09/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/24/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/12/1982Transcript filed
07/13/1982Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable IAN D. MCMASTER
357,151
11 yrs. - $2000 fine