judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-82-00549-CR
01-82-00549-CR
07/21/1982
Burglary
Francis, Arthur
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/19/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/19/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/09/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1983Submitted
03/10/1983Submission
01/14/1983Brief filed
12/09/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/15/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/18/1982Record filed
10/18/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/19/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
351,169