judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-82-00102-CR
10-82-00102-CR
07/23/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Jim Dittmer
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1982Case stored
11/17/1982Mandate issued by this Court
09/16/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/19/1982Submitted
07/23/1982Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/2082Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Falls
4966
30 Years and $5,000 Fine