judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MCMASTER

Case Information: 38314
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MCMASTERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901644FClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/11/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (Granted August 10, 2001).
08/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13822
08/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-14042
09/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 23, 2001. To Court Reporter: Kate Murray. 01-15249
09/14/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-15556
09/14/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/04/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 23, 2001. Court Reporter: Kate Murray. 01-16728
10/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Erik R. Johnson. (Docketing Statement given to counsel for appellant at front counter.) 01-16910
10/23/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-17838
01/31/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Change of Firm and Address for Sandra-Mae Pickens. 02-02068
02/20/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Schedule. This appeal was docketed in this court as a proper person appeal on August 14, 2001. The record on appeal was filed on September 14, 2001, and on that same date this appeal was submitted for a decision on the record. On October 9, 2001, attorney Erik R. Johnson filed a notice of appearance informing this court that he had been appointed as counsel for appellant. Accordingly, we vacate the submission of this appeal for decision on the record. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief within 30 days from the date of this order. fn1[Because the record on appeal has been filed with this court, we waive the requirement of filing an appendix. The parties may cite to the record on appeal in their briefs]. Respondent shall file and serve the answering brief within 20 days of service of the opening brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). Thereafter, appellant may file a reply brief, if deemed necessary, within 10 days of service of the answering brief. 02-03259
03/22/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-05150
03/25/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed March 22, 2002. NRAP 31(a)(2). Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief by March 29, 2002. 02-05259
03/28/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/28/02. Signed by: Erik R. Johnson. 02-05579
04/18/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/17/02. Signed by Sandra-Mae Pickens. 02-06953
04/24/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-07235
04/26/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 24, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the reply brief by May 6, 2002. 02-07396
05/06/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 05/06/02. Signed by: Erik R. Johnson. 02-07911
09/11/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-15743
09/11/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA
11/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA 02-19085
12/03/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-19224
12/03/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2002. 02-19224