judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANDRA MAHAFFEY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DONALD DIAL v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-09-0091)
Case Number:S-09-0091Case Docketed On:05/11/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:SANDRA MAHAFFEY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DONALD DIAL v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:SANDRA MAHAFFEY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of DONALD DIAL, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald DialDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 45
Citation:249 P.3d 234 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/11/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/11/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/29/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2009Order - Grant - extension of time (on or before 8/14/09 Counsel for Appellant shall file consent of client consenting to delay)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/16/2009Service - Mail returned - order on motion for extension of time. Post office mistakenly returned. Contacted Mr. Young's office and will fax copy of order to them, and resend.ServiceMail returnedFinal
08/12/2009Event - Phone Call from Donna Domonkos re extension of time. Appellant objects to length of extension, Ms. Domonkos will file entry of appearance and proposed date for filing brief.EventPhone CallFinal
08/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Donna D. Domonkos for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/15/2009Event - Phone Call re tickler, tickler date not re-set after filing entry of appearanceEventPhone CallFinal
09/15/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Donald Dial and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Petitioner, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/05/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/20/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/23/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant Donald DialEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/07/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2010Motion - Substitution of partyMotionSubstitution of partyFinal
01/14/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for substitution of partyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/26/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
01/29/2010Order - Substitution of party - Sandra Mahaffey is substituted as a party to this appeal and amending caption.OrderSubstitution of partyFinal
09/28/2010Order - Show cause - why this appeal should not be dismissed.OrderShow causeFinal
10/26/2010Response/Objection - Show cause orderResponse/ObjectionShow cause orderFinal
10/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division, to Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should not be DismissedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/29/2010Response/Objection - Show cause orderResponse/ObjectionShow cause orderFinal
10/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Response of appellant to order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed and motion to supplement the record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2010Order - Other Discharging Order to Show Cause Why This Appeal Should not Be DismissedOrderOtherFinal
03/11/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Golden filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/15/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
03/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for attorney's fees and costs; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal