judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00971-CV
01-89-00971-CV
09/28/1989
Automobile Personal Injury
Ray, Lawrence Earl
Philip Williams, Mary Randle Wilson, Gulf Insurance Group Co
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/13/1995Motion for rehearing filed
08/31/1995Motion for leave to fileMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/14/1995Motion for leave to file
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
11/29/1989Case ready to be set
10/27/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
09/28/1989Transcript filed
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/07/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SEPhilip Wiliams
StatePRO SELawrence Earl Ray
StatePRO SEMary Randle Wilson
Trial Court Information
County Court
Austin
2418