judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01168-CR
05-89-01168-CR
09/28/1989
Other Felony
Jennings, Gary Don
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/26/1990Mandate Issued
11/26/1990Mandate Issued
09/19/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
09/18/1990Submission
09/18/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
03/16/1990Brief Filed
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/16/1990Case ready to be set
03/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/01/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/14/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/19/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/20/1989Transcript Filed
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
09/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe Kendall
F89-74322-SN
30 yrs TDC