judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01166-CR
05-89-01166-CR
09/28/1989
Other Drug Sale
Golds, Jonathon
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1990Mandate Issued
12/18/1990Mandate Issued
10/17/1990Record RetentionRetain
10/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submitted
10/16/1990Submission
10/16/1990Submitted
09/27/1990MattConv
07/18/1990Brief Filed
07/18/1990Case ready to be set
07/18/1990Case ready to be set
07/06/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/23/1990Brief Filed
04/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/16/1990Statement of Facts Filed
01/15/1990Transcript Filed
09/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/19/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe Kendall
F89-83852-HN
25 yrs TDC & $10,000 Fine