judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-89-00117-CR
06-89-00117-CR
09/28/1989
Forgery
Lyons, Samuel Ladell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/27/1991Mandate issued
08/13/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/21/1991Submitted
05/21/1991Submission
05/13/1991Case ready to be set
05/13/1991Waiver of filing brief
05/07/1991Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/01/1991Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/24/1991No Description Available.
04/24/1991Holding for Record
04/15/1991Brief Filed
04/15/1991Holding for Record
03/12/1991Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1991Extend time to file Record
08/29/1990Order issued
06/25/1990Statement of Facts Filed
06/25/1990Holding for Record
03/08/1990LETTER
01/22/1990LETTER
10/06/1989Transcript Filed
10/06/1989Holding for Record
09/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
196th District Court
Hunt
Honorable E. Paul Banner
13,816
3 years TDC