judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00903-CR
14-89-00903-CR
09/29/1989
Burglary
Jones, Darryl D.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/1991Mandate Issued
03/21/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/21/1991Mandate Issued
02/15/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
01/31/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/31/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/16/1991Submitted
01/16/1991Submission
01/16/1991Submitted
12/21/1990Submission
11/29/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/29/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/19/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/15/1990Brf.RECD.No Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA,
05/10/1990Motion to reinstate appeal DISPOSED - APPGRANTED
05/10/1990Mtn.withdraw previous motion DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/10/1990Case reinstated
05/03/1990Motion to reinstate appeal FILED - APP
05/03/1990Motion to withdraw previous motion FILED
03/08/1990Mandate recall
02/27/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
02/15/1990Mandate Issued
02/15/1990Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/15/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
02/14/1990Submitted
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
02/08/1990Motion for new trial FILED
02/08/1990Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
01/23/1990No description available.
01/22/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/05/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/17/1989Transcript FILED
10/11/1989Date of Sentence
09/29/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/18/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/21/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasKelly McClendon
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantVon H. Shelton
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
17,957
40 years TDC