judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1316-89
PD-1316-89
09/29/1989
PDR Case Type
GRAVES, CHERYL LYNN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/25/1990BRIEF FILEDState
12/22/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
10/30/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/28/1990MANDATE ISSD
09/12/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
08/01/1990MOTIONDENIED
06/28/1990MOTION FILED
06/21/1990REHEAR FILED
06/06/1990OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
05/16/1990SUBMITTED
02/28/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
01/25/1990BRIEF FILED
01/22/1990NO BRIEF FILED
12/22/1989BRIEF FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPGranted
10/30/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/29/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/28/1990STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
GRAVES, CHERYL LYNNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles F. Baird
Michael B. Charlton
Court of Appeals Information:
14-89-00069-CR
Rev & Rem 7-13-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
Honorable BOB BURDETTE
498490