judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TANKSLEY (RICHARD) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 38313
Short Caption:TANKSLEY (RICHARD) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33823
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9400175CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/15/2002How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/14/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13820
10/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-17756
02/15/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. 02-03092
02/15/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-07642
05/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-07710
05/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/03/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 29, 2002. 02-07710