judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARNEITA FRIDIE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CV-0035
Short Caption:DARNEITA FRIDIE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7560-06Filed Date:01/07/2011

Opening Event Date:01/07/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarneita Fridie N
Gregory L. LattimerYY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 7, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b) (3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Statement Regarding Transcript.
02/24/2011RECEIVED Appellant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Statement Regarding Transcript.
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion and financial statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, and appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged motion for extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript, to which no oppoaisions have been filed, and it appearing that appellant's income exceeds the limits set for proceeding on appeal in forma pauperis, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged motion for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript. It is (MORE)
03/11/2011MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT (APPELLANT)
03/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript is granted and the statement regarding transcripts shall be filed within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (ETW) elp
03/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 12/7/10 - 12/10/10 & 12/14/10 & 12/15/10) (elp)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1(509-pgs/ronan 12/8-10/09 proc.)
06/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD# 2 (167-pgs/swaringer 12/14/09 proc.)w/cd
06/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011RECORD INDEX
07/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
08/17/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 20 days
08/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (Appellant)Granted
08/24/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix by 45 days (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix by 45 days (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledJoint Appendix (Appellant)
01/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
01/19/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
01/23/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//OPPO//REPLY
01/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to respond to the D.C.'s motion for summary affirmance Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellant)Granted
02/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET and APPELLANT'S RESPONSE SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN FEBRUARY 15, 2012
02/15/2012FiledOpposition to motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
02/24/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File deadline for filing a reply supporting summary affirmance Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
02/28/2012FiledOrder Granting MOET and the DISTRICT REPLY SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN MARCH 12, 2012
03/09/2012FiledReply of District of Columbia in support of it's motion for summary affirmance (Appellee)
04/06/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
04/06/2012FiledAffirmed
04/30/2012FiledMandate