judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

A. L. HALL, ET AL. v. GREAT NATIONAL LLOYDS

Case: A-4653
A-4653
04/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
A. L. HALL, ET AL.
GREAT NATIONAL LLOYDS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/16/1955Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/10/1954Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
05/01/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
04/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/16/1955Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/02/1955Opinion issued
07/10/1954Brief on the Merits
06/23/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/01/1954Response to Petition
04/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. L. Hall, et al.Petitioner
Great National LloydsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information