judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GROOVER, CHRISTIE & MERRITT, P.C., ET AL V. SHARON K. BURKE

Case Information: 04-CV-1115
Short Caption:GROOVER, CHRISTIE & MERRITT, P.C., ET AL V. SHARON K. BURKEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Lead:04-CV-1115Consolidated: 04-CV-1116 , 05-CV-0545 , 05-CV-0546
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8381-02Filed Date:08/20/2004

Opening Event Date:08/20/2004Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/25/2005Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/13/2006
Argued/Submitted:10/26/2006
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/02/2007

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam Higgins N
Alfred F. BelcuoreYY
AppellantGroover Christie & Merritt P.C.N
Alfred F. BelcuoreYY
AppelleeSharon Burke N
Patrick A. MaloneYN
Raymond B. Herschthal NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/20/2004NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/22/2004ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 04-CV-1115 and 04-CV-1116 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is *****MORE*****
09/22/2004 F/O that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject these appeals to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: GP)
10/12/2004STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (CV115 & CV1116) (RT - ORDERED for 3/1-5/04, 3/15-18/04, 3/2/04, 3/17/04, 3/8-12/04, 3/3/04 & 3/19/04) lw
06/13/2005ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos, 05-CV-545 and 05-CV-546 with previously consolidated appeals nos. 04-CV-1115 and 04-CV-1116 for all purposes herein. It is *****MORE*****
06/13/2005 FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued once the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court. (BY: GP)
10/25/2005RECORD INDEX 04cv1115
10/25/2005RECORD INDEX 04cv1116, 05cv545 & 05cv546
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (547-pgs/tape 3/1-5/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (97-pgs/calhoun 3/2/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (233-pgs/salzar 3/3/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (358-pgs/rogers 3/8-9/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (359-799pgs/rogers 3/10&11/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (800-972pgs/rogers 3/12/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #7 (368-pgs/rogers 3/15 &16/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #8 (180-pgs/calhoun 3/17/04 proc)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (19-pgs/ronan 3/18-19/04 proc.)
10/25/2005SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (10pgs/tape 3/19/04 proc.)
10/25/2005RECORD COMPLETED
10/27/2005CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
10/28/2005 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (GP) elp
12/07/2005APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 1/6/06
12/08/2005 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(a)(1) shall be filed on or before January 6, 2006. (BY: GP)
01/06/2006APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/06/2006APPENDIX (Volume I and II)
02/03/2006APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/deposition transcript and file a supplemental appendix (no oppo) (transcript is in the appendix).
02/03/2006RECEIVED - Aple's supplemental appendix
02/06/2006APPELLEE'S BRIEF ****filed in superior court on 2/6/06 *******docketed in DCCA 2/13/06 lw
02/07/2006 On consideration of the unopposed motion of appellee to supplement the record and to file the lodged supplemental appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted to the extent that the lodged supplemental appendix is filed. (GP) elp
02/07/2006APPENDIX (SUPPLEMENTAL) (filed by appellee)
02/13/2006BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/28/2006APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF until March 20, 2006 (no oppo)
03/02/2006 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, it is ORDERED that appellants' motion is granted and appellants' reply brief shall be filed on or before March 20, 2006. (GP) elp
03/10/2006FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/20/2006APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
04/20/2006LETTER TO COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING June-Sept. Belcuore Malone
06/05/2006LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING
08/29/2006CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
10/23/2006CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28
10/26/2006FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/26/2006ARGUED before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker Alfred F. Belcuore, Esq. for appellants Patrick A. Malone, Esq. for appellee
03/08/2007REMANDED Order (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Nebeker) remanding cause for the trial court to amend the judgment by reducing the non-economic damages portion of the jury's award to the maximum allowed under Maryland law.
03/22/2007APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR COSTS & ATTORNEY FEES
03/26/2007TMC - appellant's motion for costs - opposition
04/02/2007MANDATE ISSUED
04/03/2007RECEIVED Appellee's Objections to Appellant's Bill of Costs.
04/05/2007 ORDERED that appellants' request for costs is DENIED and each is to bear its own costs in this matter. See D.C. App. R. 39 (a)(2). (GLBRNE)